CA AB2198 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11862 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: FI$Cal: transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2198 Obernolte (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2198 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2198 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5166.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4644.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11862 | Amended Code | Citation Text |