CA AB2196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 20776, 21037, 21039, 21050, and 21073.1 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement: service credit: payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2196 COOPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2196 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2196 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-06AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5039.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5130.)
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback