CA AB2195 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39607 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural gas: out-of-state sources: greenhouse gases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2195 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2195 Chau et al. By Stern (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2195 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-13 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6498.).
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5444.).
2018-08-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
2018-06-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5410.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback