CA AB2193 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 313.1 and 313.2 to the Education Code, relating to English learners.
Title
Long-term English learners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2193 LARA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2193 Lara By Padilla (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2193 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2193 Lara By Padilla (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2193 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6316.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4707.). | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-06 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 10. Page 5127.) | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). | |
2012-03-21 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 313.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 313.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 313.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 52059 | Amended Code | Citation Text |