CA AB2192 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 59 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the military.
Title
Governor’s Military Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2192 V.A (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2192 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2192 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4382.). |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4726.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |