CA AB2192 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13989.2, 13989.4, and 13989.6 of, and to repeal Section 13989.8 of, the Government Code, relating to state-funded research.
Title
State-funded research: grant requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2192 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2192 Mark Stone et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2192 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2192 Mark Stone et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2192 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6618.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5518.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5005.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66010.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13989.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13989.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13989.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13989.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |