CA AB2191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 35622 to the Public Resources Code, relating to ocean resources.
Title
Ocean Protection Council: White Shark Population Monitoring and Beach Safety Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2191 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5589.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 35622 | New Code | See Bill Text |