CA AB2189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 25215.52 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 10 of the Statutes of 2016, relating to hazardous substances, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous substances: lead: cleanup: Exide Technologies facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2189 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5621.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25173.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25173.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code25200.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code25215.52New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback