CA AB2183 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 361.4 and 16519.5 of, and to add Section 11461.36 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Foster care: resource family.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] |
Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.) |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11461.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |