CA AB2183 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2736 and 2786.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to nursing.
Title
Nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2736 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2786.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2842 | Amended Code | Citation Text |