CA AB2183 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-06 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-06 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17537.9 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 15640 of the Government Code, and to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 1660) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: assessors: county board of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2183 SMYTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2183 SMYTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-05-31 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-04-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4556.) | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17537.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6515 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 1660 | New Code | See Bill Text |