CA AB2182 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23399.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control: winegrowers: wine sales event permits.
Sponsors
Asm. Beth Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2182 Beth Gaines By Gaines (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2182 GAINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2182 GAINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4300.). |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4970.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23399 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23399.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |