CA AB2182 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 836 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Airports: firearms: arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2182 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2182 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 4929.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 836 | Amended Code | Citation Text |