CA AB218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 861, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 340.1 and 1002 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 905 of the Government Code, relating to childhood sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Damages: childhood sexual assault: statute of limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Gonzalez et al. By Jackson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 218 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Gonzalez et al. By Jackson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - AB 218 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Noes: (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 861, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3612.).
2019-09-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3612.)
2019-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2955.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-04SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2019-04-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 3. Page 956.)
2019-03-25AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 812.)
2019-03-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 12).
2019-03-07AssemblyMeasure version as revised on March 6 corrected.
2019-03-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-02-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-01-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
2019-01-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1002Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure340.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code905Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback