CA AB2177 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11372.5 and 11372.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to penalty assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalty assessments: fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - AB 2177 JONES-SAWYER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2018-04-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4532.)
2018-03-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-03-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11372.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11372.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback