CA AB2172 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 21003 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting: inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 2172 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2172 Weber By Hertzberg (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2172 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-06-04SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S.
2018-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 4999.)
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25).
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code21003Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback