CA AB2160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 488, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 45256, 88003, and 88076 of the Education Code, relating to classified employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classified employees: school and community college districts: part-time playground positions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2160 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2160 Thurmond By Lara (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2160 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 488, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6889.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5895.).
2018-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27).
2018-06-11SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5408.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and HIGHER ED.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code45256Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88003Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88076Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback