CA AB216 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3010 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vote by mail ballots: identification envelopes: prepaid postage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Assembly - AB 216 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB216 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 216 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:15 a.m.
2018-07-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14.).
2018-06-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4825.).
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-15SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 1904.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-01-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
2017-01-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code3010Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback