CA AB216 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51225.3 of, and to add Section 51225.1 to, the Education Code, relating to high school graduation requirements, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
High school graduation requirements: pupils in foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 216 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB216 Stone Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 216 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB216 Stone Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 216 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3093.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2235.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1007.). |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51225.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |