CA AB216 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2223, 2224, 2225, and 2226 of, and to add Section 2227 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voters: residency confirmation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Assembly - AB 216 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB216 Swanson By Correa (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 216 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB216 Swanson By Correa (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 216 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 495, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6612.). | |
2012-08-29 | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29). | |
2012-08-28 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6468.) | |
2012-08-24 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4635.). | |
2012-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-15 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 6). | |
2012-07-05 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4283.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1643.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-03-16 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-02-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 84810.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2224 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2227 | New Code | See Bill Text |