CA AB2155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 84501, 84502, 84504.1, 84504.2, 84504.5, and 84504.3 of, and to add Section 84501.1 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2155 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2155 Mullin By Hill (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2155 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2155 Mullin By Hill (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2155 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 777, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 5839.). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5437.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 82025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84501.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84504.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |