CA AB2153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.7 (commencing with Section 218) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to teachers.
Title
Teachers: in-service training: lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, queer, and questioning pupil resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2153 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2153 Thurmond et al. By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2153 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2153 Thurmond et al. By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2153 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 6850.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 5761.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 5618.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 218 | New Code | See Bill Text |