CA AB2149 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3496 of, and to add Part 5.6 (commencing with Section 7110) to Division 4 of, the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Gates: standards: inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2149 Connolly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2149 Connolly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 10.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 16). |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3496 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 7110 | New Code | See Bill Text |