CA AB2149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.4 (commencing with Section 22598) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Food delivery platforms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2149 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2149 Gonzalez By Stern (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2149 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2149 Gonzalez By Stern (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2149 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 5348.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4399.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 18). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 4750.) |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (May 5). |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22598 | New Code | See Bill Text |