CA AB2145 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 48070.6, 48273, 48900.8, and 48916.1 of, and to add Section 48916.2 to, the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: expulsion and suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2145 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2145 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 5126.) | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-28 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48070.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48273 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48900.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48916.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48916.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |