CA AB2144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.7 (commencing with Section 5049.1) to Chapter 1 of Division 5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.
Title
State parks: Chino Hills State Park: wildfires.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5049.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2144 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2144 |