CA AB2141 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39719 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: community projects: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2141 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 4884.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |