CA AB2139 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 18941.12 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.
Title
Building standards: local rebuilding plans: state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2139 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2139 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2139 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4681.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5035.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18941.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |