CA AB2139 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 442.5 and 442.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to terminal illness.
Title
End-of-life care: patient notification.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2139 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2139 Eggman By Leno (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2139 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2139 Eggman By Leno (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2139 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 6385.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4710.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 5338.) |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 6). |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 442 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 442.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 442.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 442.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |