CA AB2138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7.5, 480, 481, 482, 488, 493, and 11345.2 of, and to add Section 480.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing boards: denial of application: revocation or suspension of licensure: criminal conviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2138 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2138 Chiu et al. By Skinner (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2138 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5633.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback