CA AB2136 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 3362) to Title 2 of Part 1 of Division 4 of the Civil Code, relating to damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Damages: lead-based paint.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2136 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2018-06-21SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Coms. on EQ., JUD., and APPR.
2018-06-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-19SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5617.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code3362New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13703New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback