CA AB2134 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-27 - In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-27 - In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5348 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Community mental health services: assisted outpatient
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2134 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2134 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-06-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 5030.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8). | |
2012-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-01 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5348 | Amended Code | Citation Text |