CA AB2129 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19817 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming Policy Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19817Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback