CA AB2127 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49475 of, and to add Section 35179.5 to, the Education Code, relating to interscholastic sports.
Title
Interscholastic sports: full-contact football practices: concussions and head injuries.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2127 Cooley By Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2127 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2127 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 5. Page 4020.). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 4936.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4706.) |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35179.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 49475 | Amended Code | Citation Text |