CA AB2126 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14001 of, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 14410) to Division 12 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to resources conservation.
Title
California Conservation Corps: forestry corps program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2126 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2126 Eggman et al. By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2126 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2126 Eggman et al. By McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2126 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7014.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5982.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5406.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14410 | New Code | See Bill Text |