CA AB2125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 15365) to Chapter 4 of Division 15 of, and to repeal Section 15560 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election results: risk-limiting audits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2125 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2125 Quirk By Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - AB 2125 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6902.).
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5897.).
2018-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5694.)
2018-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2018-05-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-05-21AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5240.)
2018-05-21AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5240.)
2018-05-21AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-05-21AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2018-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code15360Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code15365New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code15560Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback