CA AB2118 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5109, 5133, 5139, 5142, 5143, 5311, 5314.5, 5315, and 5322 of, and to add Sections 5110.7, 5144, and 5314.7 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to household goods carriers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Household goods carriers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2118 BUTLER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AB2118 Butler (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2118 BUTLER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
2012-08-27 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6371.).
2012-08-24 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-23 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4784.).
2012-08-15 Ordered to special consent calendar.
2012-08-08 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-07 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
2012-08-06 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-19 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-06-12 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2012-06-07 Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2012-05-25 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-05-25 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4985.)
2012-05-17 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-05-16 From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2012-05-02 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-05-01 Read second time and amended.
2012-04-30 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2012-04-16 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-03-12 Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2012-03-08 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-02-24 From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2012-02-23 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2118&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_bill_20120223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_bill_20120501_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_bill_20120612_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_bill_20120806_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_bill_20120831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_bill_20120925_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_vote_20120423_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_vote_20120516_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_vote_20120525_1019AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_vote_20120625_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_vote_20120806_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_vote_20120823_0436PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2118_vote_20120827_0554PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback