CA AB2118 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11713.20 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: dealers: consumer credit score disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2118 HERNANDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2118 HERNANDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-06-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-29 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4598.) | |
2010-04-07 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 5). | |
2010-03-15 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |