CA AB2117 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 486, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 486, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4980.72, 4984.01, 4996.17, 4996.28, 4999.60, and 4999.100 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Marriage and family therapists: clinical social workers: professional clinical counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2117 ARAMBULA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2117 Arambula By Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2117 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2117 Arambula By Galgiani (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2117 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 486, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6370.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5271.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4644.) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4980.72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4984.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |