CA AB2116 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15100 of the Education Code, relating to school bonds.
Title
School bonds: projections of assessed property valuations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Assembly - AB 2116 GALLAGHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2116 Gallagher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2116 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2116 Gallagher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2116 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5643.). |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4644.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4464.) |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 15100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 15278 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 15284 | Amended Code | Citation Text |