CA AB2115 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1366.50 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10786 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: disclosures.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2115 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2115 Wood By Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2115 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2115 Wood By Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2115 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6292.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5230.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4900.) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1366.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1366.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10128.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |