CA AB2113 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11502.5, 11531, 12114, 12798, 12811.5, 12812, 12824, 12825, 12841, 12841.1, 12841.4, 12842, 12847, 12999.4, 13000, 14006.5, and 14009 of, and to add Sections 11401.7, 11412, 11520, 12811.2, 12824.5, 12839, and 12840 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, and to amend Section 21080 of the Public Resources Code, relating to pesticides, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Pesticides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Assembly - AB 2113 Garcia Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2113 Garcia By Becker Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2113 Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2113 Garcia By Becker Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2113 Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-07-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-07-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 6119.). |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.). |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4666.) |
2024-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and AGRI. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 5431.) |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5352.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5290.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |