CA AB2109 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 120365 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to communicable disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communicable disease: immunization exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2109 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2109 Pan By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2109 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
2012-08-27 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 29. Page 6330.).
2012-08-23 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-22 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4709.).
2012-08-21 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-20 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-08-08 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-07 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
2012-06-28 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-20 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2012-05-31 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2012-05-10 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-05-10 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 4770.)
2012-05-03 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-02 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
2012-04-24 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-23 Read second time and amended.
2012-04-19 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 17).
2012-03-12 Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2012-02-24 From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2012-02-23 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code120365Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2109&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_bill_20120223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_bill_20120423_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_bill_20120620_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_bill_20120820_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_bill_20120831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_bill_20120930_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_vote_20120417_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_vote_20120502_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_vote_20120510_1027AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_vote_20120627_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_vote_20120806_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_vote_20120822_0403PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2101-2150/ab_2109_vote_20120827_0249PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback