CA AB2107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-04 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 53839 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: securitized limited obligation notes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2107 Rodriguez et al. By Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2107 Rodriguez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-07-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-07-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29).
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2020-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12).
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2020-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2020-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53839Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback