CA AB2107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3010, 3050.5, 3065, 11713.3, 11713.13, and 11726 of, to amend and repeal Sections 3050, 3050.1, 3050.7, and 3085.10 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 3066 of, to add Sections 3065.2 and 3065.25 to, to add and repeal Section 3065.3 of, to repeal Section 3085.10 of, and to repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 3052) of Chapter 6 of Division 2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to new motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New Motor Vehicle Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2107 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2107 Reyes By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2107 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5376.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5300.)
2018-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2018-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback