CA AB2105 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66424 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: Subdivision Map Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-03 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |