CA AB2103 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49077 of the Education Code, relating to pupil records.
Title
Pupil records: court orders: disclosure exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49077 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |