CA AB2103 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 515 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: wages and hours: overtime.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2103 Ammiano By Lieu (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2103 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2103 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2012-08-13 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-08-13 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4471.). | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-05-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 4710.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |