CA AB21 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13515.28 of, and to add Section 13515.285 to, the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: training.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Diane Papan [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13515.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13515.285 | New Code | See Bill Text |