CA AB21 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 13 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4293.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to forestry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forestry: electrical transmission and distribution lines: clearance: penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 24).
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code4293.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback